TRAFFORD RAPE CRISIS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support and information to women and girls who have suffered sexual violence or abuse; through helpline, Live Chat and email services. We also offer counselling and group work. In addition, we have an Independent Sexual Violence Advocate, aimed at Black and ethnically minoritised women. Working in partnership with commissioners, local groups, voluntary and statutory organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £190,940 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 29 July 2013: Standard registration
- TRC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Greenwood | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Omolade Allen | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanne Harding | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Handby | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Slinger | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruhiya Yousuf | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.59k | £204.87k | £203.57k | £230.23k | £279.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.06k | £151.97k | £185.25k | £231.25k | £280.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £120.35k | £202.87k | £197.21k | £228.20k | £190.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF WOMEN AND GIRLS WHO HAVE SURVIVED RAPE OR SEXUAL ABUSE BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT. 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TALKS, TRAINING AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 314
PEEL HOUSE
30 THE DOWNS
ALTRINCHAM
CHESHIRE
WA14 2PX
- Phone:
- 01619682820
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window