Accounts and annual returns BAT MELECH UK LIMITED

Charity Number: 1145298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 September 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 July 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required