Ethiopian Orthodox Tewahedo Church Diocese of United Kingdom and Ireland

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising Ethiopian Orthodox Tewahedo Churches across UK and Ireland; providing guidance to the churches; holding of prayers, meetings lectures and conferences in advancing the Orthodox faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 11 November 2011: Standard registration
- ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH DIOCESE OF NORTH WEST EUROPE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archbishop Abba Hisgrace Yacob | Chair | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mulugeta Tesfa | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Trevor Desmond O Field | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kefyalew Aschalew | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Semegne Alemayehu | Trustee | 05 October 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.56k | £4.26k | £2.20k | £3.30k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £1.40k | £1.36k | £4.65k | £4.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2009 as amended on 26 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO FAITH IN NORTH WEST EUROPE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS AND LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE FAITH AND BY REPRESENTING AND ACTING AS A COMMON VOICE OF ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCHES IN NORTH WEST EUROPE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
105A HARROW ROAD
LONDON
E11 3PS
- Phone:
- 07341339751
- Email:
- nwediocese@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window