Financial history THE SUNNYBANK TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1143663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £237.62k £218.20k £180.07k £195.00k £208.85k
Total expenditure £160.01k £223.12k £206.64k £225.00k £238.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £42.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £24.92k £42.00k N/A N/A