THE SUNNYBANK TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sunnybank Trust supports adults with learning disabilities and autism to say what they want and live the life they choose. Through our range of services Voices, Choices, Futures - we provide advocacy, clubs and activities for adults of all ages as well as transition support for young adults when starting out in their adult lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Merton
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 05 September 2011: Standard registration
- 13 November 2012: Funds received from 1085978 THE SUNNYBANK TRUST
- THE SUNNYBANK TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Reeve | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANDREWS MAAT, ACCA | Trustee | 18 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Luke Jennings | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Christoper Mark Snell | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jacky Oliver | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK EADE | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM RHIND TUTT | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM BROWN | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.62k | £218.20k | £180.07k | £195.00k | £208.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.01k | £223.12k | £206.64k | £225.00k | £238.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £42.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £24.92k | £42.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sunnybank Trust
The Old Town Hall
The Parade
EPSOM
Surrey
KT18 5AG
- Phone:
- 01372732376
- Email:
- info@sunnybanktrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window