AYSHA ACADEMY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ACTIVITIES ARE THE WELFARE BENEFIT ADVICE AND EDUCATION FOR THE PEOPLE LIVING IN BEDFORD IN THE UK. WE WILL ADVANCE THE EDUCATION BY PROVISION OF MOTHER TONGUE ESOL AND SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL. WE SHALL PROVIDE IN THE FACILITIES OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR CHILDREN, YOUTH, MEN AND WOMEN, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
Governance
- 31 October 2011: Standard registration
- 29 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.29k | £12.17k | £9.86k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48k | £13.59k | £12.26k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 08 October 2018 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 08 October 2018 | 677 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES LIVING IN THE UK WHO EXPERIENCE LANGUAGE BARRIERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE OF BANGLADESHI ORIGIN BY PROVIDING INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING/ADVOCACY/ HEALTH/HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION AND AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN BANGLADESH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND EDUCATION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE CLASSES AND A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN. 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window