Accounts and annual returns OXFORD BIBLE CHURCH TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1143463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 05 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 05 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 29 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window