KENSINGTON DRAGONS FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting community participation for primarily young people in football training sessions and entering teams in competitve football leagues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 02 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Palmira Morais | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Alexander Michael Schneideman | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Patricia Tierney | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MURPHY | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SHIRLEY | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CARLO PIRZIO-BIROLI | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CLANCY | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.60k | £77.01k | £101.18k | £146.72k | £154.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.59k | £93.28k | £91.23k | £136.47k | £134.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ALL PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION): 1. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION OF, PRIMARILY, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF RACE, SEX, CREED, FINANCIAL MEANS OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL ("FOOTBALL") AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" MEANS ANY OF LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTITIES); AND 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SO THAT THEY MIGHT GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS, BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chapel
LONDON
Wellington Road
London
NW10 5LJ
- Phone:
- 02089691991
- Email:
- honsec@kensingtondragons.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window