Financial history INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR APPLIED ECONOMETRICS

Charity number: 1146741
Charity reporting is up to date (274 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £181.46k £35.91k £41.35k £64.80k £78.27k
Total expenditure £160.33k £23.59k £15.25k £9.93k £38.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A