Trustees EAQUALS
Charity number: 1143547

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Aitken | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Erdem Hacifazlioglu | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Serkan Aras | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Silvana Richardson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giorgio Iemmolo | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Wallis | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Moore | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thom Kiddle | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.