Accounts and annual returns GERRARDS CROSS COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1145772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 February 2024 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 February 2023 08 December 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 February 2022 02 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 February 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 February 2020 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 February 2020 Not Required