DANCEABILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote social inclusion for people with a learning disability by providing facilities for dance classes, dance groups, recreation and public performances, with the objective of improving their social and communication skills, increasing their confidence and self-esteem and improving their physical and mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Brent
- Harrow
Governance
- 17 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Patrick Dutson | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|||||
ANGUS MAULE BOYD | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD ALAN LOVEDAY | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ELIZABETH PHELAN | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £0 | £112 | £5.47k | £564 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.11k | £30 | £628 | £1.75k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I)PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR DANCE CLASSES, DANCE GROUPS AND RECREATION; AND (II)PROVIDING DANCE CLASSES, DANCE GROUPS, PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR SOCIAL AND COMMUNICATION SKILLS, INCREASING THEIR CONFIDENCE AND SELF-ESTEEM AND IMPROVING THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Boxtree Lane
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 6JN
- Phone:
- 02088663864
- Email:
- DANUTALOVEDAY@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window