Accounts and annual returns THE BOLTON PERCY GATEHOUSE PRESERVATION FUND

Charity number: 502127
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 March 2009 23 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2008 09 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2007 26 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2006 09 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 15 March 2005 11 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2005 Not Required