Financial history THE BOLTON PERCY GATEHOUSE PRESERVATION FUND

Charity Number: 502127
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/03/2005 15/03/2006 15/03/2007 15/03/2008 15/03/2009
Total gross income £750 £1.15k £450 £0 £2.00k
Total expenditure £1.46k £911 £961 £1.01k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A