FRIENDS OF PHOENIX SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide equipment for use in the school To provide activities for the children during the school holidays To host events with the purposes of fundraising To host events with the purposes of inclusion, Education, Support and Enjoyment To raise money to pay for a new adapted mini bus and a multi sensory room
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £92,466 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 08 December 2011: Standard registration
- FOPS (Working name)
- FOPS (Previous name)
- FOPSS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF PHOENIX SCHOOL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF PHOENIX SCHOOL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE PHOENIX SPECIAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Day | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Woodrow | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebbeca Bocskei | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.91k | £26.87k | £67.02k | £73.38k | £110.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.38k | £21.98k | £69.99k | £83.80k | £113.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | N/A | £42.53k | £58.72k | £92.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE PHOENIX SCHOOL, KEIGHLEY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AT THE SCHOOL. (2) THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND PLAY FACILITIES, CARE AND SUPPORT AND INFORMATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAY PLAY SESSIONS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beckfoot Phoenix Special School
Braithwaite Ave
Keighley
WEST YORKSHIRE
West Yorkshire
BD22 7NS
- Phone:
- 01535607038
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window