EMMANUEL UNITED REFORMED AND METHODIST CHURCH REDDITCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) the celebration of public worship b) the teaching of the Christian faith c) mission and evangelism d) pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved e) the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs f) the support of other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 September 2011: Standard registration
- EMMANUEL CHURCH REDDITCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM MARTIN | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIANE MARTIN | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
GLYNN CARR | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARIE DAVIES | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CARR | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES HAMILTON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSALYN JEAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA JOY REHARD | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELAINE CHANEY | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH THOMAS | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN JACQUELINE MARSH | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN GEE | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
KAY BRADLEY | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael Schofield | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PITT | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE LOUISE HALL | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PEARL JOY SWANBOROUGH | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ANNE WHITE | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.38k | £178.23k | £190.58k | £230.49k | £224.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.61k | £197.72k | £217.54k | £261.53k | £236.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Church
Ecumenical Centre
Evesham Walk
Kingfisher Shopping Centre
REDDITCH
Worceste
- Phone:
- 01527544005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window