GOLDEN GROVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acquire, restore and conserve for the Community and Public Benefit the historic buildings known as Golden Grove, together with its historic Gardens, Arboretum, surrounding Gardens and Parkland known as Gelli Aur. Additionally, provide opportunities for education, leisure, well-being, or other identified local charitable needs, by maintaining public access and ensure it is sustainably maintained.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENDRIK JAN SMIT | Chair | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Johnathon Smith | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DALJIT SINGH | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 28/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.12k | £32.29k | £91.36k | £57.06k | £123.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.55k | £115.35k | £109.33k | £111.83k | £107.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.70k | £43.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2024
(These accounts |
25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES WHICH BENEFIT THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO: - ACQUIRE, RESTORE AND CONSERVE FOR THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC BENEFIT THE HISTORIC BUILDINGS KNOWN AS GOLDEN GROVE, CARMARTHEN, TOGETHER WITH ITS HISTORIC GARDENS, ARBORETUM, SURROUNDING GARDENS AND PARKLAND KNOWN AS GELLI AUR, AND ASSOCIATED BUILDINGS AND STRUCTURES. - PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EDUCATION, LEISURE, WELL-BEING, OR OTHER IDENTIFIED LOCAL NEEDS WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, BY MAINTAINING AND MANAGING PUBLIC ACCESS TO AND USE OF THIS SPACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY, AS WELL AS ENSURING THAT IT IS SUSTAINABLY MANAGED FOR THE FUTURE.
Area of benefit
CARMARTHEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cwrt-Y-Gorffwys
Golden Grove
CARMARTHEN
Dyfed
SA32 8NN
- Phone:
- 07900334880
- Email:
- info@goldengrove.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window