KAKATUA BULU COCKATOO SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity accepts unwanted cockatoos from all over the UK where they then have lifelong sanctuary, we do not rehome. Please contact us via our web site for further information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Coppard | Trustee | 26 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE CHISHOLM | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ROY CHISHOLM | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.95k | £15.00k | £24.34k | £29.54k | £26.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.01k | £15.12k | £17.55k | £26.07k | £24.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/08/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF COCKATOOS AND OTHER PARROTS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH BIRDS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS BIRDS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR COCKATOOS AND OTHER PARROTS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE. TO RAISE AWARENESS AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL AND BIRD WELFARE IN GENERAL AND HELP PREVENT CRUELTY AND SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 289
STOWMARKET
SUFFOLK
IP14 9EH
- Phone:
- 07434524543
- Email:
- COCKATOOSANCTUARY@ICLOUD.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window