THE STALISFIELD VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the inhabitants of the village of Stalisfield in Kent. The village hall is used for meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditons of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £17,717 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 27 September 2011: Standard registration
- 06 March 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1194093 STALISFIELD VILLAGE HALL TRUST
- STALISFIELD MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.69k | £8.78k | £14.47k | £18.19k | £50.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.51k | £18.97k | £12.21k | £9.47k | £41.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.36k | £17.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF STALISFIELD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: "(A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND" "(B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS."
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window