BETHEL EVANGELICAL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1143626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bethel Evangelical Baptist Church is a group of Christians committed to serving God in the local community by helping to address spiritual, social and practical needs. The church is independently governed by its own church officers and income is largely from gifts. Activities include Sunday Services, Prayer Meeting/Bible study, Children's Club, Toddlers' Group, fellowship events and schools work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £105,990
Total expenditure: £79,827

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Caerphilly

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARC HOWELLS Trustee 13 July 2014
None on record
Rev Alun Johnson Trustee 13 July 2014
None on record
Rev STEPHEN DARBY Trustee 27 August 2011
None on record
PETER MARTIN Trustee 27 August 2011
None on record
JOHN MORLEY Trustee 27 August 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.66k £49.92k £57.92k £58.47k £105.99k
Total expenditure £45.90k £42.52k £53.37k £57.57k £79.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.61k £10.18k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
88 BEDWLWYN ROAD
YSTRAD MYNACH
HENGOED
CF82 7AE
Phone:
01443819984