Financial history ST KATHARINE'S TRUST

Charity number: 1143837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.92k £35.11k £33.71k £10.92k £15.19k
Total expenditure £12.17k £20.63k £42.11k £4.62k £481
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A