Accounts and annual returns VIRTUAL HEALTHCARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145237
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2019 09 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 November 2019 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 26 January 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required