Financial history VIRTUAL HEALTHCARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145237
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2015 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £187 £293 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.23k £2.48k £10.24k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A