Financial history SHEFFORD SPORTS & COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1144861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £144.49k £101.21k £181.77k £128.10k £181.46k
Total expenditure £78.50k £79.69k £108.38k £136.69k £151.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £16.91k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.80k £16.91k £5.23k N/A