MOUNT HOREB APOSTOLIC CHURCH - TIPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
3 X WEEKLY CHURCH SERVICES FUNERALS AND BABY BLESSINGS ANNUAL SUNDAY SCHOOL OUTING CHOIR SESSIONS HELPING THE SICK, AGED AND POOR COUNSELLING VISITING LOCAL NURSING HOMES MONTHLY FELLOWSHIP DINNER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sandwell
Governance
- 04 April 2012: Standard registration
- MOUNT HOREB CHURCH (Working name)
- BETHEL UNITED CHURCH TIPTON (Previous name)
- BETHEL UNITED CHURCH- TIPTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew LANDELL | Chair | 14 August 2011 |
|
|||||
PAULINE FORBES | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SISTER D CASCOE | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVANGELIST C LANDELL | Trustee | 14 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEACON S BECKFORD | Trustee | 14 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.09k | £30.78k | £22.99k | £19.44k | £24.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.01k | £14.59k | £9.30k | £15.16k | £17.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAPLE VIEW
9 Radlow Crescent
Marston Green
BIRMINGHAM
B37 7LZ
- Phone:
- 01217888573
- Email:
- HOREBMHC@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window