MARCHAM COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing the community with leisure facilities to meet local needs: As a membership organisation with elected directors, MCG represents its members' views. On important issues, and to report back to members and seek their views, MCG holds open meetings to which non-members are welcome. Since June 2020, MCG operates village hall and playing fields on behalf of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 24 October 2011: Standard registration
- MCG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Francis Pam | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Harvie | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Paul Dix | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Trevredyn Hoath | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Mander | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Patrick Grady | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Peter Trinder | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Hill | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Robert Barnes | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.57k | £52.86k | £87.57k | £101.24k | £84.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £36.97k | £79.11k | £74.96k | £103.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.85k | £40.01k | £21.57k | £3.70k | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2017 as amended on 17 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PROVISION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MARCHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF FACILITIES (INCLUDING A COMMUNITY BUILDING AND PLAYING FIELDS) FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Barrow Close
Marcham
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX13 6TY
- Phone:
- 01865507211
- Email:
- MAIL@MARCHAM.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window