Trustees MARCHAM COMMUNITY GROUP
Charity number: 1144407

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Francis Pam | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Harvie | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Paul Dix | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Trevredyn Hoath | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Mander | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Patrick Grady | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Peter Trinder | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Hill | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Robert Barnes | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.