THE DEBORAH UBEE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Promoting emotional well being and raising awareness on emotional health -Providing a range of therapeutic services to all -Providing support and training to placement counsellors -Promoting good practice around therapeutic interventions -Offer continuing professional development to practitioners
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 11 October 2011: Standard registration
- TDUT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Ian Topham | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Longley | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Joy Harding Reeves | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rabiya Mckeverne | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kabir Dev | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATE NIGHTINGALE | Trustee | 13 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.35k | £224.65k | £192.38k | £308.48k | £308.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.20k | £180.26k | £217.63k | £269.16k | £269.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.20k | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/10/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/09/2011 as amended on 08 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
The Charity?s ?objects? are the preservation and protection of mental health, and promoting better emotional wellbeing in particular, by; A) Offering a professional and effective counselling service for all, irrespective of their ability to pay. B) Providing a holistic, therapeutic support service tailored to individual need, including specialist 1-2-1 trauma informed counselling, domestic and sexual violence specialist support, and engaging with neurodiverse adults and children. C) The provision and delivery of therapeutic workshops and groups -helping service users meet their own needs and to participate more fully in society. D) Working with other partners to meet the above objectives, to share and disseminate best practice, develop specialist knowledge, raise awareness of and the understanding of mental ill-health, and to reduce the stigma and taboo associated with seeking mental health support.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 EGERTON DRIVE
LONDON
SE10 8JS
- Phone:
- 02083056460
- Email:
- reception@tdut.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window