WALLASEY ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Islamic cultural activities. Five times a day prayer. Learning how to read Quran. Visit the sick, provide funeral servise ,Give comfort to sick and elderly. etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 14 November 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGSAR MIAH CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
TALIMUL ISLAM | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
KHUHINOOR MIAH | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAZON MIAH | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
AJMAL ALI | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
KAZI AHMED B.SC, ACEA | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.95k | £12.00k | £7.50k | £3.55k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.95k | £11.95k | £6.11k | £3.25k | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY, TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Islam Centre
46 King Street
WALLASEY
CH44 8AU
- Phone:
- 01512010357
- Email:
- KAZI.AHMED2244@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window