Accounts and annual returns WALL VILLAGE HALL (WATLING STREET)

Charity Number: 1146941
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 11 March 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 02 December 2024 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 01 April 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 April 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 31 March 2023 396 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 March 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required