Let the Children Hear

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LTCH works in developing countries helping to:-: Relieve deaf, hearing impaired, poor children(0-16 years) and their families Educate deaf or hearing impaired children by provision of specialist facilities and health care specialists. Educate young people, their families, health care professionals and outreach workers in prevention, treatment and management of hearing impairment and deafness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 December 2011: Standard registration
- 03 October 2022: Funds received from 1144233 AUD-M-ED TRUST
- IHCC (Working name)
- LTCH (Working name)
- IAN HUTCHEON CLINIC FOR CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF ROBINS | Chair | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Russell SRN SCM DN | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH JILL CHOUDHURY Reg. Nurse | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHOUDHURY | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.14k | £60.65k | £63.77k | £52.76k | £77.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.56k | £57.82k | £40.11k | £47.56k | £47.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.55k | £5.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 NOV 2011 as amended on 15 Oct 2019 as amended on 08 Feb 2022 as amended on 02 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE POOR YOUNG PEOPLE (0-16 YEARS) WHO ARE DEAF OR HEARING IMPAIRED AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF A MOBILE CLINIC 2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF POOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE DEAF OR HEARING IMPAIRED BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST FACILITIES AND HEALTH CARE SPECIALISTS 3.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF POOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS AND OUTREACH WORKERS IN THE EFFECTIVE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CAUSES OF HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND DEAFNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Ambrose Lane
HARPENDEN
Hertfordshire
AL5 4AU
- Phone:
- 07976567496
- Email:
- geoff@letthechildrenhear.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window