KIPEPEO DESIGNS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kipepeo Designs (KD) works in partnership with Kipepeo designs Trust engaging people living in poverty in Kenya to produce greetings cards. The cards are distributed throughout the UK by (Kipepeo Designs Trading) Ltd.. KD also provide education in areas including business management to help people to be independent. Christianity is promoted through devotions and Bible study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 10 November 2011: Standard registration
- 01 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.29k | £4.72k | £2.47k | £3.11k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £828 | £5.00k | £4.01k | £4.35k | £55 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 21 October 2019 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 29 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUL 2011
Charitable objects
4.1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN KENYA, OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH (I) OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMPLOYMENT AND LEARNING; AND/OR (II) GOODS AND/OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 4.2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN KENYA, OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. THIS INCLUDES SKILLS WHICH PROVIDE THE POTENTIAL FOR INCOME GENERATION AND BUSINESS SKILLS WITH WHICH TO ENSURE SUSTAINABILITY 4.3)TO PROMOTE AND UPHOLD THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window