Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BOLTON LE SANDS CARNFORTH

Charity Number: 1144401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £98.31k £89.51k £162.36k £106.44k £123.29k
Total expenditure £90.96k £88.86k £138.42k £123.38k £129.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.86k N/A £6.00k N/A N/A