THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BOLTON LE SANDS CARNFORTH

Charity number: 1144401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The people of the Parish Churches of Holy Trinity endeavour to proclaim the good news of Jesus Christ by witness and example and promote the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £123,287
Total expenditure: £129,761

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 2011: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Fitzgerald BA, CoEPQH Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Peter-John Davies BSc,MBA Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Janet Ann Pardula Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Helen Wadeson Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jane Margaret Longton Trustee 07 May 2023
THOMAS ROBINSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Peter Graham Hamborg Trustee 24 April 2022
THOMAS ROBINSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BOLTON LE SANDS FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Received: On time
DAVID RUSSELL LONGTON Trustee 18 October 2020
SOUTH LAKES CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
THE ELSPETH J THOMPSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Margaret Isabel Foster Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Robert Whitaker Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Kathrine Elizabeth Brough Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Margaret Hutchinson Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
ROBERT DAUNT Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Andrew Hampshire BA Hons Trustee 16 April 2016
None on record
ANDREW THOMAS WILLIAMS Trustee 23 May 2013
None on record
DAVID GEORGE BATEMAN B ED Trustee 24 October 2011
THOMAS ROBINSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BRIAN JAMES Trustee 16 September 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £98.31k £89.51k £162.36k £106.44k £123.29k
Total expenditure £90.96k £88.86k £138.42k £123.38k £129.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.86k N/A £6.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 08 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holy Trinity Church
Main Road
Bolton le Sands
Carnforth
LA5 8DU
Phone:
01524824322