SURREY REUSE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It represents and supports other community based furniture and appliance reuse and recycling organisations across Surrey. It's main aim is to develop a sustainable network of reuse services to benefit the people of Surrey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 May 2012: Standard registration
- SRN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Watson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD STANLEY BAKER | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.85k | £757 | £1.02k | £549 | £193 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE:(1)THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:(A)THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF WASTE REDUCTION, REPAIR AND REFURBISHMENT, REUSE, RECYCLING, AND ENERGY RECOVERY SERVICES.(B)ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF RESOURCE EFFICIENCY, THROUGH WASTE MINIMISATION E.G. REPAIR, REFURBISH AND REUSE; RECYCLING AND ENERGY RECOVERY.(2)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH:(A)REUSE AND RECYCLING OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO BENEFIT THOSE IN OR VULNERABLE TO HARDSHIP OR POVERTY.(B)PROVISION OF WORK PLACEMENT AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LONG-TERM UNEMPLOYED OR OTHER DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE TO ASSIST THEM IN GAINING OR RETURNING TO EMPLOYMENT.(3)THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF RECYCLING AND REUSE CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS IN SURREY BY PROMOTING THE BETTER ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THEIR RESOURCES.(4)TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF SURREY COUNTY COUNCIL (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Furniture Helpline
Hampshire House
Hampshire Road
BORDON
GU35 0HJ
- Phone:
- 07920279646
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window