Obesity Action

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?Raise awareness of obesity and it?s adverse health consequences, through lobbying parliament together with public and private engagement events; ?Support research into obesity and its health consequences ? with a particular emphasis on its liver and pancreas consequences; ?Educate adolescents & mothers about healthy eating prior to pregnancy and healthy feeding of their offspring;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 2012: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 February 2016: Re-registered
- OBESITY ACTION CAMPAIGN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JUDE OBEN | Chair | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alastair Sutcliffe | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Grossman | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £89 | £7.51k | £230 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.40k | £0 | £2.03k | £2.21k | £524 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 August 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 August 2024 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 May 2022 | 339 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/10/2011 as amended on 07 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
1)PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS WHO SUFFER WITH OBESITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND ADVICE. 2)ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO OBESITY, INCLUDING SUPPORT OF OBESITY RELATED RESEARCH, ESPECIALLY RESEARCH THAT SEEKS TO UNDERSTAND THE EFFECT OF OBESITY ON LIVER AND PANCREAS FUNCTION, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department of Gastroenterology
Guy's and St Thomas' Hospital
Westminster Bridge Road
London
SE1 7EH
- Phone:
- 02071887188
- Email:
- INFO@OBESITYAC.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window