LONDON STOCKS AND SHARES MUSEUM LTD

Charity number: 1144441
Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN THE CITY OF LONDON TO FURTHER THE CAUSE OF FINANCIAL EDUCATION IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • STOCK EXCHANGE MUSEUM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN SIDNEY HARDCASTLE FOSTER-POWELL FCCA MCSI Trustee 26 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 CHURCH HILL
LONDON
SW19 7BN
Phone:
02089464052
Website:

No information available