Financial history TRINITY CONCERT BAND

Charity Number: 1145098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £36.51k £24.62k £13.51k £18.84k £15.04k
Total expenditure £31.32k £26.03k £14.47k £19.89k £14.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100 N/A N/A N/A N/A