TRINITY CONCERT BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trinity Concert Band is a wind band based in Lower Earley in Reading, Berkshire. We play music from a wide range of sources including classical transcriptions, original band compositions, music from stage and screen, pop and swing as well as the traditional marches! We raise money for charities at some of our concerts and provide entertainment at local charity events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 15 December 2011: Standard registration
- TCB (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Newson | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steph Plunkett | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jane Violet Berry | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Neale | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Neale | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN KERRY | Trustee | 21 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIET KAY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 21 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.04k | £36.51k | £24.62k | £13.51k | £18.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.82k | £31.32k | £26.03k | £14.47k | £19.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £100 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 January 2021 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOV 2009 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Muir Gate
Binfield
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG42 4GF
- Phone:
- 01189731558
- Email:
- secretary@trinityband.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window