PESHRAFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peshraft is an international charitable trust which operates in the UK and the Republic of Tajikistan. Our aim is to promote and advance the education of people living in and from the republic of Tajikistan in such ways as the trustees think fit. More information can be found on our web-site: https://www.peshraft.charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Tajikistan
Governance
- 05 January 2012: Standard registration
- TAJIKINVEST CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
UKTAM AMON | Chair | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLO KURBANOV | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Zuhursho Rahmatulloev | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
AZAMAT SULTANOV MBA | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
FIRDAVS SHAKHIDI | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/04/2020 | 15/04/2021 | 15/04/2022 | 15/04/2023 | 15/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.51k | £7.43k | £2.46k | £2.50k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.10k | £6.87k | £2.32k | £2.50k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/11/2011 as amended on 08 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE LIVING IN AND FROM THE REPUBLIC OF TAJIKISTAN IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 419
Denison House
20 Lanterns Way
LONDON
E14 9JJ
- Phone:
- 07702888525
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window