CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£11,760,000
Donations and legacies | £2.39m | |
Charitable activities | £5.42m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.87m | |
Other | £83.00k |
Total expenditure:
£12,763,000
Raising funds | £2.82m | |
Charitable activities | £9.94m | |
Other | £0 |
£20,604,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.94m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.94m | |
Retained for future use | £19.60m |
People

110 Employee(s)
38 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 08 September 2011: Standard registration
- CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE (Previous name)
- PRESIDENT AND SCHOLARS OF THE COLLEGE OF CORPUS CHRISTI IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
38 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor HELEN MOORE | Chair | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Luke Webster | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy Lidster | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Fergus McGhee | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Michael Cotterell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Newstead | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susanna Dunachie | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Giuseppe Pezzini | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rebekah Lee | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lyle | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kathryn Stevens | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marion Olivia Durand | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Judith Olszowy-Schlanger | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katherine Paugh | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Armstrong | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Wrathall | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Pier Palamara | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Alexander Duffy | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew Niall Dyson | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Constanze Magdalene Guthenke | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Rolfe | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor NICOLE GROBERT | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HANS KRAUS | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor PAWEL SWIETACH | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GIOVANNI CAPOCCIA | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor COLIN AKERMAN | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr NEIL MCLYNN | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL DELLAR | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor ROBIN ANDREW MURPHY | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor JOHN ELSNER | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Tobias Reinhardt | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor MICHAEL BENJAMIN JOHNSTON | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor JOHN WATTS | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor ELIZABETH FISHER | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN HARRISON | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK WORMALD | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PETER NELLIST | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.30m | £6.57m | £7.65m | £14.58m | £11.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11m | £9.41m | £13.48m | £11.51m | £12.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.65m | £1.13m | £1.45m | £6.66m | £2.39m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.52m | £3.41m | £4.21m | £4.95m | £5.42m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £276.00k | £441.00k | £302.00k | £213.00k | £269.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.78m | £1.75m | £2.29m | £3.19m | £3.87m | |
|
Income - Other | £346.00k | £285.00k | £0 | £0 | £83.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £10.00k | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.42m | £7.86m | £11.50m | £9.13m | £9.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.69m | £1.55m | £1.98m | £2.38m | £2.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.00k | £12.00k | £83.00k | £80.00k | £86.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.35m | £1.34m | £1.51m | £1.97m | £2.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £73.90m | £78.07m | £22.45m | £25.83m | £300.40m | |
|
Long-term investments | £143.82m | £174.96m | £248.44m | £256.22m | £268.17k | |
|
Other assets | £6.85m | £2.18m | £25.12m | £19.11m | £19.41m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.65m | -£1.16m | -£3.14m | -£1.36m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £31.38m | £32.76m | £63.02m | £63.22m | £62.56m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER DATED 1517 AND STATUES LAST AMENDED 31 MAY 2000 as amended by an Order in Council on 19 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING A COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD CALLED CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE
MERTON STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4JF
- Phone:
- 01865276700
- Email:
- college.office@ccc.ox.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window