DEEPDENE SENIORS LEARNING SKILLS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR ACTIVITIES INCLUDE CHAIROBICS, KNITTING, CROCHET, BOARD GAMES AND ICT FOR BEGINNERS, BINGO, RAFFLE ,BRIDGE & CHESS, BONUS BALL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES SUCH AS TERMLY BRING AND SHARE LUNCH AND ANNUAL CHRISTMAS LUNCH AND TRIP TO THE SEASIDE ( WEATHER PERMITTING!). OTHER ACTIVITIES RUN WHICH ARE SUBJECT TO FUNDING ARE: FLOWER ARRANGING AND HAND MASSAGES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 22 November 2011: Standard registration
- DEEPDENE CLUB (Working name)
- DEEPDENE CLUB (Previous name)
- DEEPDENE SENIORS LEARNING SKILLS CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marilyn Jill Midford | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Smalling | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ashdown | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CARMEN MARY MARLENE HARMER | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.93k | £113 | £1.47k | £13.83k | £4.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.33k | £364 | £2.88k | £5.24k | £6.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS AND THE LOCAL AREA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR AGE, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: PROVIDING COMPUTER TRAINING AND OTHER SKILLS AND ADVANCING THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; OLD AGE OR ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
159 Okehampton Crescent
WELLING
Kent
DA16 1DH
- Phone:
- 07947798745
- Email:
- Debbie.ashdown@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window