RACE EQUALITY FIRST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Race Equality First is an independent charity working in Wales to promote equality. We offer a range of services including free, confidential advice and support to victims of discrimination/harrassment. We also offer advice, training, and information relating to equalities. We provide information about equality and a lobby voice for issues regarding diversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£649,429
Donations and legacies | £13.40k | |
Charitable activities | £617.32k | |
Other trading activities | £13.27k | |
Investments | £2.95k | |
Other | £2.49k |
Total expenditure:
£730,666
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £730.67k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £730.67k |
People

10 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 16 September 2011: Standard registration
- 03 December 2012: Funds received from 1001035 RACE EQUALITY FIRST
- RACE EQUALITY FIRST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Khalid Osman | Chair | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
GURMIT RANDHAWA | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Reynette Roberts | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sakina Jamal | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Hugh Dela Cruz | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Captain Catherine Burton FRAeS | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Samina Khan | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Professor Meena Upadhyaya | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Kebba Manneh | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mohammad Taha Idris OBE, JP | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mutaher Jehan Khatib | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.68k | £722.11k | £445.36k | £700.45k | £649.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.47k | £370.33k | £419.02k | £580.63k | £730.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £207.56k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £50.12k | N/A | £268 | £13.40k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £9.69k | N/A | £29.17k | £13.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £659.96k | N/A | £661.06k | £617.32k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £50 | N/A | £1.14k | £2.95k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £2.29k | N/A | £8.82k | £2.49k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £370.33k | N/A | £580.63k | £730.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.57k | N/A | £3.51k | £3.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £3.01k | N/A | £6.43k | £3.65k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £603.79k | N/A | £751.15k | £655.92k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £42.38k | N/A | £47.01k | £30.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/09/2015 as amended on 23 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 3.1.1. WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION 3.1.2. PROMOTING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY ACROSS ALL PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS WITHIN THE EQUALITY ACT 2010 3.1.3. PROMOTING RIGHTS AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Race Equality First
First Floor West
113-116 Bute St.
Cardiff
CF10 5EQ
- Phone:
- 02920486207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window