Trustees CROYDON BUSINESS VENTURE LIMITED
Charity number: 1145658

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Ginsburg | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Francis | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Burgess | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dwayne Miller | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Rutherford | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Taylor | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siffat Shah | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Corrina Sanya | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JO-ANN MICHELLE GUMB | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.