Financial history THE MANTA TRUST

Charity number: 1145387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £539.85k £490.85k £737.77k £973.42k £734.91k
Total expenditure £452.59k £434.75k £544.55k £856.52k £842.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £39.71k
Income - Donations and legacies £517.38k N/A £721.22k £960.67k £712.30k
Income - Other trading activities £22.47k N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £16.24k £11.76k £21.12k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £308 £630 £1.48k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £370 £4.80k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £245.60k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £391.91k N/A £500.43k £731.79k £742.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £60.68k N/A £44.12k £124.73k £100.19k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £3.70k £0 £12.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £391.91k N/A £456.14k £24.08k £30.54k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0