THE MANTA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity?s key objectives are the conservation of manta rays and their close relatives, mobula rays throughout the world?s oceans. Manta rays can be considered charismatic megafauna; diving and snorkelling with these creatures is a sought after experience the world over. Our vision is to see these animals thriving in healthy, diverse ocean ecosystems the world over.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£739,703
Donations and legacies | £712.30k | |
Charitable activities | £21.12k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.48k | |
Other | £4.80k |
Total expenditure:
£842,926
Raising funds | £100.19k | |
Charitable activities | £742.74k | |
Other | £0 |
£4,798 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £39,706 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £100.19k | |
Charitable expenditure | £742.74k |
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- Cameroon
- Costa Rica
- Ecuador
- Fiji
- French Polynesia
- Indonesia
- Maldives
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Palau
- Papua New Guinea
- Peru
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Seychelles
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- United States
Governance
- 11 January 2012: Standard registration
- 21 November 2020: Funds received from 1160470 OCEAN GIANTS TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Jane Curtis | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMILY LOUISE HUMBLE | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Attrill | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HUGH BROOKE DIAMOND | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAM JACKSON | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £539.85k | £490.85k | £737.77k | £973.42k | £734.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £452.59k | £434.75k | £544.55k | £856.52k | £842.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £517.38k | N/A | £721.22k | £960.67k | £712.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £22.47k | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £16.24k | £11.76k | £21.12k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £308 | £630 | £1.48k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £370 | £4.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £245.60k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £391.91k | N/A | £500.43k | £731.79k | £742.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £60.68k | N/A | £44.12k | £124.73k | £100.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £3.70k | £0 | £12.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £391.91k | N/A | £456.14k | £24.08k | £30.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £20.25k | £40.62k | £55.41k | |
|
Other assets | £484.03k | N/A | £713.97k | £808.95k | £704.39k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.50k | N/A | £4.56k | £3.00k | £16.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/06/2011 as amended on 11 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CONSERVATION OF MANTA RAYS, THEIR RELATIVES, AND THEIR NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN UK TERRITORIAL AND GLOBAL WATERS; AND 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF MANTA RAYS AND THEIR RELATIVES AND THEIR NATURAL HABITATS. 3.1.3 TO CONDUCT, SUPPORT, AND DISSEMINATE RESEARCH INTO MANTA RAYS, THEIR RELATIVES, AND THEIR NATURAL HABITATS TO FURTHER THEIR CONSERVATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Catemwood House
Corscombe
Dorchester
DT2 0NT
- Phone:
- 01935891744
- Email:
- info@mantatrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window