EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH SUTTON-ON-SEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CONDUCTING REGULAR SUNDAY SERVICES, BIBLE STUDIES AND PRAYER MEETINGS, SUNDAY SCHOOL AND COFFEE MORNINGS FROM TIME TO TIME. RUNNING ALPHA COURSES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 October 2011: Standard registration
- EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Gayton | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Howes | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin Button | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN ROSCAMP | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|||||
JOHN BLACKWOOD MAXWELL | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.02k | £18.92k | £24.30k | £21.20k | £21.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.31k | £19.53k | £25.35k | £19.89k | £33.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/02/2006
Charitable objects
1.AS A PLACE FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR THE SERVICE OF ALMIGHTY GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DECLARATION OF FAITH AND THE STATEMENT OF PRACTICE. 2.AS A PLACE GOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS OR AS A CHURCH HALL OR AS A PLACE FOR THE PROMOTION OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND USAGES SET OUT IN THIS DEED. 3.AS A PLACE FOR MAINTAINING AND PRACTICING THE DOCTRINE AND RITE OF THE BAPTISM OF CHRISTIAN BELIEVERS BY IMMERSION AND NO OTHER BAPTISM 4.AS THE CURTILAGE OF ANY SUCH PLACE AS AFORE SAID.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel
Trusthorpe Road
Sutton-on-Sea
MABLETHORPE
LN12 2LL
- Phone:
- 01507443219
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window