Financial history MOOR POOL HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1148252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £127.22k £116.75k £140.79k £236.89k £162.11k
Total expenditure £103.81k £79.44k £123.39k £104.03k £143.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.75k £2.82k £110.46k £9.90k