Trustees MOOR POOL HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 1148252

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON STIRLING | Chair | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Thomson | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Green | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Phil Simpson | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Copley | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JILL HOWES | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIA CLARE BELLINGHAM | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr NIGEL BARTRAM | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.