THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, DRAYTON IN HALES

Charity Number: 1144116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church of England Parish church of Market Drayton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £200,982
Total expenditure: £385,977

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 2011: Standard registration
  • 03 October 2013: Funds received from 244467 CHARITY OF MRS ANN HUDSON FOR MARKET DRAYTON NURSI...
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S PCC, MARKET DRAYTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Catherine Sarah McBride Chair 21 November 2017
THE COLLEY SALTER CHRISTMAS FUND
Received: On time
DRAYTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR ROWLAND HILL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARKET DRAYTON FOODBANK
Received: On time
Hilary Talbot Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Kathryn Ellen Slater Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Justin Glanville Frankfort Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Peter Ernest Fox Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Janet Gilliland Trustee 04 September 2023
None on record
Stephen Gordon Glover Trustee 03 July 2023
MARKET DRAYTON MENCAP
Received: On time
Geoffrey Malcolm Oakes Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Richard Joseph Priestley Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Margaret Anne Everett Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Professor Lindsay Bashford Trustee 16 April 2018
SIR ROWLAND HILL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE COLLEY SALTER CHRISTMAS FUND
Received: On time
DRAYTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
FOUNTAINS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
CAROL CORNEY Trustee 07 April 2014
None on record
VAL CREASEY Trustee 04 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £202.71k £263.73k £259.17k £253.45k £200.98k
Total expenditure £157.21k £255.41k £200.30k £209.23k £385.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £5.80k £45.71k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Church
Church Street
MARKET DRAYTON
Shropshire
TF9 1AD
Phone:
01630653505